Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 01/19/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 01/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 01/19/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 02/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/08/1999