Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/09/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/09/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 11/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/10/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/10/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/01/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/16/2000
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/09/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/09/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/09/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/25/2000
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 07/12/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/11/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/11/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew