Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 06/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 07/15/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/26/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/26/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 07/26/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/15/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/15/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/02/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/11/2000