Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/04/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 08/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/14/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 02/14/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/01/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 04/04/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 04/04/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/13/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/18/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/18/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/18/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/19/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/19/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 07/19/2000