Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/24/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 06/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/09/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 04/06/2000