Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 08/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 08/03/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 08/03/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 08/03/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 08/03/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/03/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 08/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 08/03/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 08/04/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 08/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/21/1999