Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/03/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/03/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 08/03/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 08/03/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 08/03/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 08/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 09/08/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/22/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/22/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/22/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/22/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/22/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/22/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/22/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/22/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/29/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/29/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 09/29/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 10/06/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/06/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 10/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/06/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 10/20/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/20/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/28/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/28/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 10/28/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/28/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 11/09/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/16/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/16/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/18/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 02/01/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/08/2000
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/01/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/09/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew