Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/29/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 07/13/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/15/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/29/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/25/2000