Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/21/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 10/21/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/28/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 01/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 02/02/2000
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 02/02/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/14/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/14/2000
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 02/14/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/01/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/01/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/14/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/30/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/11/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/11/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/26/2000