Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/30/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 06/30/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/30/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 06/30/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/30/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/26/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/05/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/09/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/15/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/15/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/15/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/15/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/22/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 09/22/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/24/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/24/1999