Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/03/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 02/03/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 02/03/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/03/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/03/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 02/03/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/03/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 02/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/03/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/03/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/03/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/03/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/03/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/03/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 02/03/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/03/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 02/03/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/03/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/03/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/23/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 02/23/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/23/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/23/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/23/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/23/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 02/23/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/23/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/23/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 02/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/23/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 06/08/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/08/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/22/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/22/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/22/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/22/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/22/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/02/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/02/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/02/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 11/02/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/16/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/16/1999