Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 07/16/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 08/04/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 10/13/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/03/2000