Refine your search

8 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
05/22/2000 Became Public Law No: 106-203. (TXT | PDF)
05/22/2000 Signed by President.
05/11/2000 Presented to President.
05/04/2000 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3557)
04/13/2000 Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported to Senate by Senator Smith, of NH without amendment. Without written report.
03/28/2000 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 0 (Roll no. 76).(text: CR H1426)
03/23/2000 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-540.
06/30/1999 Introduced in House