Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/14/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/14/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/14/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/21/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/26/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/26/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/02/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 08/02/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 08/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 08/02/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 08/02/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/14/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/22/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 09/23/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/28/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/01/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 10/06/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/06/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/12/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/12/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/12/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/12/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/12/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 10/18/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 10/18/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/25/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/28/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/28/1999