Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/01/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/01/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/01/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 07/01/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/01/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/27/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/27/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 07/27/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/27/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 08/05/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/09/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/09/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 09/09/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/29/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/25/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 10/25/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 11/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/08/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/10/1999