Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/01/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 07/01/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/12/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/20/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/20/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/22/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/27/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/29/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/29/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 07/30/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/12/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 01/24/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 02/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 02/08/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/08/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 02/29/2000
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/29/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/16/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/28/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/04/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/11/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/11/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/24/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/24/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 05/25/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 06/08/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/08/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/19/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/19/2000
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/19/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/20/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/20/2000
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/20/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/20/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/21/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/21/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/21/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/21/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/21/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/23/2000
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/23/2000
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/27/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/27/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/27/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/10/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/10/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/10/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/10/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/10/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 07/10/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 07/10/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/10/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 07/10/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/11/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 07/11/2000
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/11/2000
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/12/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 07/13/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/13/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/13/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/18/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/18/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 07/18/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/18/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/18/2000
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 07/18/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/20/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/26/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/07/2000
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/07/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/07/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/18/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/02/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 10/02/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/06/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/06/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/06/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/06/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/06/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/06/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/06/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 10/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/06/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/06/2000
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 10/12/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/17/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/17/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/24/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/24/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/27/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/27/2000