Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/13/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/16/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 07/16/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/16/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/16/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/16/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/16/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/26/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/26/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/26/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/26/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 07/29/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 08/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/03/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/04/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/15/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/21/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 09/21/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/23/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/30/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 09/30/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/19/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/08/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/09/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 01/27/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/27/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/27/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/02/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/08/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 02/10/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 02/15/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/29/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/01/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/01/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/08/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/16/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2000
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2000
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/10/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/10/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/09/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/09/2000