Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/03/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/03/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/10/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/18/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/18/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/18/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/25/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/13/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/28/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 04/28/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/06/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/20/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/20/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/17/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/24/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/02/2000