Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 07/14/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/14/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/14/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/14/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 07/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 07/20/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/20/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/30/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/30/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/09/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/18/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/19/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/15/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/22/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/28/2000
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 03/28/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/28/2000
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/29/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/29/2000
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/03/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/02/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/08/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/27/2000