Text: H.R.2513 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Bill Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (11/19/1999)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 2513 Referred in Senate (RFS)]

  1st Session
                                H. R. 2513


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                            November 3, 1999

                                Received

                           November 19, 1999

    Read twice and referred to the Committee on Governmental Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 AN ACT


 
 To direct the Administrator of General Services to acquire a building 
        located in Terre Haute, Indiana, and for other purposes.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. ACQUISITION OF BUILDING.

    (a) Acquisition.--The Administrator of General Services shall 
acquire by transfer from the United States Postal Service the real 
property and improvements located at 30 North Seventh Street in Terre 
Haute, Indiana.
    (b) Reimbursement.--The transfer under subsection (a) shall be made 
without reimbursement, except that the Administrator shall provide to 
the Postal Service an option to occupy 8,000 square feet of renovated 
space in the building acquired under subsection (a) at no cost for a 
20-year term.

SEC. 2. RENOVATION OF BUILDING.

    (a) In General.--The Administrator of General Services shall 
renovate the building acquired under section 1, and acquire parking 
spaces, to accommodate use of the building by the Administrator and the 
United States Postal Service.
    (b) Authorization of Appropriations.--Subject to the requirements 
of section 7(a) of the Public Buildings Act of 1959 (40 U.S.C. 606(a)), 
there is authorized to be appropriated to carry out this section 
$5,000,000 for fiscal years beginning after September 30, 1999. Such 
sums shall remain available until expended.

            Passed the House of Representatives November 2, 1999.

            Attest:

                                                 JEFF TRANDAHL,

                                                                 Clerk.