Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/29/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 07/29/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/04/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/12/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/06/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew