Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/22/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/26/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/26/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 08/03/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/08/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/23/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/01/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/07/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/18/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/10/2000