Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/15/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/19/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/19/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/21/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/22/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 08/04/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 09/14/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/15/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/15/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 09/22/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 10/01/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/01/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/07/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/07/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/18/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/19/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/20/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/18/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/18/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/18/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/18/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 11/18/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/18/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 11/18/1999
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 01/31/2000