Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 07/26/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/29/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 07/29/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 07/29/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 08/03/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 08/05/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/24/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/24/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/24/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/24/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 10/12/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/12/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 10/12/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 10/19/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 01/31/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/14/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/29/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/29/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/15/2000