Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 07/27/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/27/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/27/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 07/27/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 07/27/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 07/27/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/30/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 08/05/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/29/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/09/2000