Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 07/20/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/22/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 10/21/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/01/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew