Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 07/20/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 07/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/20/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 10/01/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/27/2000
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 02/09/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 03/01/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 03/21/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/02/2000
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/02/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/02/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 05/17/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/08/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/14/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/15/2000
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/12/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/12/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/24/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/25/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/26/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/27/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/29/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/10/2000