Text: H.R.2565 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-46 (08/11/1999)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 46]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ046.106]


[[Page 113 STAT. 227]]

Public Law 106-46
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
To clarify <<NOTE: Aug. 11, 1999 -  [H.R. 2565]>> the quorum requirement 
   for the Board of Directors of the Export-Import Bank of the United 
                                 States.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. CLARIFICATION OF QUORUM REQUIREMENT FOR THE EXPORT-IMPORT 
            BANK OF THE UNITED STATES.

    (a) In General.--Section 3(c)(6) of the Export-Import Bank Act of 
1945 (12 U.S.C. 635a(c)(6)) is amended to read as follows:
    ``(6) A quorum of the Board of Directors shall consist of at least 
three members.''.
    (b) Exception.--Notwithstanding <<NOTE: 12 USC 635a note.>> section 
3(c)(6) of the Export-Import Bank Act of 1945, if, during the period 
that begins on July 21, 1999, and ends on October 1, 1999, there are 
fewer than three persons holding office on the Board of Directors of the 
Export-Import Bank of the United States, the entire membership of such 
Board of Directors shall constitute a quorum until the end of such 
period.

    Approved August 11, 1999.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 2565:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 145 (1999):
            July 26, considered and passed House.
            Aug. 5, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>