Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 07/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/20/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 07/20/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 07/20/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/21/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/21/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 07/22/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/26/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 10/06/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/03/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/15/2000