Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 07/20/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 07/22/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/22/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 07/27/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/27/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 08/05/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 08/05/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 11/18/1999