Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 07/26/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/27/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/29/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/29/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/30/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/30/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/27/2000