Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 07/22/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 07/22/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 09/08/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/08/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/08/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/08/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/27/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/27/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/08/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 11/08/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 11/08/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/08/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 11/08/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 11/08/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 11/08/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/08/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/23/2000
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/10/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/10/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/10/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/12/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/12/2000