Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 08/03/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/15/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/15/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/23/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/23/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/29/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/04/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/04/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 10/12/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/12/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/19/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/25/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/25/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/03/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/08/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/16/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/16/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/16/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/01/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/10/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/15/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/01/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/01/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/08/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/22/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 03/23/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/23/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/23/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 04/05/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 04/05/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/05/2000
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/11/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 04/12/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 04/13/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/02/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/02/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/24/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/25/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/06/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/08/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/14/2000
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 06/19/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/22/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/10/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/10/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/12/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/20/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/26/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/14/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/27/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 10/04/2000