Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 07/29/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/15/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/18/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/13/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/13/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/16/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/16/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/29/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 05/11/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/25/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/25/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/10/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/10/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 11/14/2000