Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 09/14/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 09/23/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/30/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/30/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 09/30/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/05/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/07/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/12/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 10/18/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/27/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/27/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/27/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/04/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 11/08/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 11/16/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 04/10/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/03/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/03/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/04/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/17/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 09/20/2000