There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Separation of Powers Restoration Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To restore the separation of powers between the Congress and the President.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/30/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
10/28/1999Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law
10/24/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
07/30/1999Referred to House Rules
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1999Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1999Referred to House International Relations
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1999Referred to the Committee on International Relations, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Rules, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
07/30/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/21/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/07/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/13/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/03/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/17/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/09/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/13/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 12/04/2000

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations07/30/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary07/30/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Commercial and Administrative Law10/24/1999 Referred to
10/28/1999 Hearings by
House Rules07/30/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2655.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2655. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (07/30/1999)

Separation of Powers Restoration Act - Repeals the War Powers Resolution. Terminates after 90 days all powers and authorities of the President and any other Federal officer or employee or executive agency from a declaration of national emergency.

States that, to the extend that any Act of Congress grants to the President or any other executive officer or employee the power to declare a national emergency, such power is divested to Congress alone.

Directs the President to include with each presidential order a statement of the specific statutory or constitutional authority for such action.

States, with exceptions, that a presidential order neither constitutes nor has the force of law and is limited in application and effect to the executive branch.

Authorizes both Houses of Congress, a Senator or Representative, certain State and local officials, and certain aggrieved persons to bring an action to challenge the validity of any presidential order which exceeds the power granted to the President by the relevant authorizing statute or the Constitution.