Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 07/30/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 09/21/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/07/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/07/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/13/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/28/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 11/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/02/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 11/03/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 11/17/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/07/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 02/09/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/10/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 02/29/2000
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/08/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/08/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/04/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/11/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 06/13/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/21/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/13/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 12/04/2000