Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/09/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/19/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/25/2000