There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rail Passenger Disaster Family Assistance Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a program, coordinated by the National Transportation Safety Board, of assistance to families of passengers involved in rail passenger accidents.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/04/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
09/13/1999Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-313.
08/03/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber
10/05/1999SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce.
10/04/1999-2:31pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/04/1999-2:31pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/04/1999-2:28pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2681.
10/04/1999-2:28pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9249-9251)
10/04/1999-2:28pmHouseMr. Petri moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/13/1999HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 188.
09/13/1999HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 106-313.
08/05/1999HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/05/1999HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/04/1999HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Ground Transportation
08/04/1999HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Ground Transportation
08/03/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Ground Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
08/03/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
08/03/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/03/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 08/03/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/03/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure08/03/1999 Referred to
08/05/1999 Markup by
09/13/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-313
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Ground Transportation08/03/1999 Referred to
08/04/1999 Markup by
08/04/1999 Reported by
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/05/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.2681.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.2681. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/03/1999)

Rail Passenger Disaster Family Assistance Act of 1999 - Amends Federal transportation law to require the Chairman of the National Transportation Safety Board, as soon as practicable after being notified of a rail passenger accident involving a major loss of life, to: (1) designate and publicize the name and phone number of a Board employee who shall be a director of family support services responsible for acting as a point of contact within the Federal Government for the families of passengers involved in a rail passenger accident and a liaison between the rail passenger carrier and the families; and (2) designate an independent nonprofit organization (with experience in disasters and posttrauma communication with families) which shall have primary responsibility for coordinating the emotional care and support of the families of passengers involved in such accidents. Sets forth the responsibilities of the Board and designated organization.

Directs each rail passenger carrier to submit to the Secretary of Transportation and the Chairman of the Board a plan for addressing the needs of the families of passengers involved in a rail passenger accident resulting in a major loss of life. Shields a rail passenger carrier from liability for damages (except for gross negligence or intentional misconduct) in any action brought in a Federal or State court arising out of the carrier's performance in preparing or providing a passenger list, or in providing information concerning a train reservation, pursuant to the carrier's plan.