Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/08/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/23/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/04/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/19/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/27/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/06/2000