Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/27/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/27/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/30/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/19/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/27/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/01/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/01/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/01/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/08/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/10/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 11/10/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/16/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/27/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 02/01/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/02/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/14/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 02/15/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/02/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 03/09/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/13/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/14/2000
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/15/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/15/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/16/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/16/2000
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/30/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/02/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/20/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/06/2000