Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/30/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 11/18/1999