Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 08/04/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 09/08/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/23/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 09/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 09/23/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/30/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/30/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/30/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/30/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/30/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 09/30/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/30/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/20/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 10/20/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/20/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/20/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/17/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/17/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 11/17/1999