Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 01/19/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/19/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/19/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/19/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 01/19/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 01/19/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/19/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 01/19/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/19/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/19/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/08/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/11/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/02/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/02/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/02/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/14/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/26/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/05/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/05/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/17/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 11/17/1999