Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/12/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/26/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/10/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/19/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/12/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/13/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/17/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/18/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/19/2000
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/20/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/24/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/24/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/25/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/26/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 07/26/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/26/2000
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/06/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/06/2000
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 09/06/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/06/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/06/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/06/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/06/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 09/06/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/06/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/06/2000
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/06/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 09/06/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 09/06/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 09/06/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/06/2000
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 09/06/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/06/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 09/06/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/07/2000
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/11/2000
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/11/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/11/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/11/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/11/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 09/11/2000
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/11/2000
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 09/11/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/12/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/12/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 09/12/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/12/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 09/14/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/14/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/18/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/19/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/19/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/19/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 09/19/2000
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/19/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/19/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/19/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 09/25/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 09/25/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 09/26/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/27/2000