Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 09/21/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 09/21/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/21/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 09/21/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 09/30/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/01/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/05/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/12/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/12/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/13/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/18/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/18/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 10/25/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 10/25/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 10/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 10/26/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/02/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/02/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 11/02/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 11/04/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/10/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 01/31/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/31/2000
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/14/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/29/2000
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/14/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/21/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/30/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/30/2000
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/03/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/03/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/03/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/03/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/05/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/05/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/08/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/23/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/23/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/23/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/07/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/07/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/07/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/15/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/15/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/07/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 09/12/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/14/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/18/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 09/20/2000
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 09/26/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/28/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/12/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/18/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 12/07/2000