Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 08/05/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/09/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/09/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 09/09/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/09/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/09/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/09/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/09/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/22/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/22/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/22/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 09/22/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/22/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/22/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/27/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/27/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/27/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/13/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/14/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/19/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/19/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/26/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/28/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/28/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 10/28/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/01/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 11/01/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 11/01/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/01/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/01/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/01/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/03/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 11/08/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/10/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/10/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 01/27/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/10/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/12/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 05/08/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/08/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 05/10/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/10/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/10/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/17/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 05/24/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/22/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/12/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/25/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/27/2000