Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/21/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/21/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 09/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/27/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 09/27/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/28/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 10/05/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/05/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/14/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/14/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 10/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 10/14/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/14/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/14/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/19/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/19/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/26/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 10/26/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 11/09/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/18/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/06/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 04/06/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/12/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/12/2000