Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/05/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/05/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 10/05/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 10/06/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/07/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 10/12/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 10/13/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/13/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 10/19/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/19/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/27/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/27/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 10/27/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/27/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/08/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 11/10/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/16/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/16/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 11/17/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 11/17/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 11/18/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/01/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/30/2000
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/30/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 04/06/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 04/06/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/06/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/06/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/12/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/13/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/13/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/11/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 09/12/2000