Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 08/05/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 09/13/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/13/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/13/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 09/13/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/13/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/13/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/13/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/13/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/13/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 09/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 09/13/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/27/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/27/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/27/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/27/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/27/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 09/27/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/27/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/27/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/10/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/20/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/03/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 04/04/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 04/04/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/04/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/05/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/05/2000
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/05/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/05/2000
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/05/2000
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/05/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 04/05/2000
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/10/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 04/10/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/10/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 04/10/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/10/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/10/2000
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/11/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/11/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/11/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/03/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/03/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/03/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/03/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/03/2000
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/03/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/03/2000
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/03/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/03/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/03/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/03/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/08/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/12/2000